U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cv-04060
  • Case Name: Rhone v. Schmanke et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Record on Appeal Retrieved by 10CCA]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order]
  • April 08, 2025: [Appeal Number Information]
  • April 07, 2025: [Preliminary Record on Appeal Sent]
  • April 07, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 07, 2025: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 07, 2025: [Appeal Filing Fee Waived/Not Paid]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
October, 2024
  • October 01, 2024: [Exhibits]
  • October 01, 2024: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 01, 2024: [Response to Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.