U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-02108
  • Case Name: American Food & Vending Corporation v. Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, The
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • April 14, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 14, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 14, 2025: [Reply]
  • April 11, 2025: [File Excess Pages]
  • April 08, 2025: [Seal or Redact Document(s)]
  • April 07, 2025: [Seal or Redact Document(s)]
  • April 01, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Proposed Sealed Record]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Proposed Sealed Record]
  • March 31, 2025: [PROVISIONALLY SEALED Exhibits in Support of Response/Reply]
  • March 31, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • March 31, 2025: [PROVISIONALLY SEALED Exhibits]
  • March 31, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal or Redact Document]
  • March 18, 2025: [Seal or Redact Document(s)]
  • March 17, 2025: [Seal or Redact Document(s)]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice of Proposed Sealed Record]
  • March 11, 2025: [PROVISIONALLY SEALED Exhibits in Support of Motion]
  • March 11, 2025: [Pretrial Order]
  • March 10, 2025: [Notice of Proposed Sealed Record]
  • March 10, 2025: [PROVISIONALLY SEALED Exhibits in Support of Motion]
  • March 10, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 10, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • March 10, 2025: [Partial Summary Judgment]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
  • October 10, 2024: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • October 10, 2024: [Stipulation]
  • October 10, 2024: [Order on Motion for Discovery Hearing]
  • October 10, 2024: [Discovery Hearing]
  • October 07, 2024: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • October 07, 2024: [Leave]
  • October 01, 2024: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 01, 2024: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.