U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:23-cv-04117
  • Case Name: Kull Auction & Real Estate Co., Inc. v. Miller
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
April, 2025
  • April 09, 2025: [Administratively Closing Case]
  • April 09, 2025: [Telephone Conference]
  • April 08, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order]
  • April 02, 2025: [Status Report]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Index of Exhibits]
  • October 07, 2024: [Response to Motion]
  • October 01, 2024: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 01, 2024: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.