U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:23-cv-01197
  • Case Name: Slash F. Cattle Company, LLC v. Agridyne, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Leave to Amend Complaint]
  • May 09, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice of Service]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Issue Subpoena]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • April 16, 2025: [Telephone Conference]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 16, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 14, 2025: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • April 10, 2025: [Hearing]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Service]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice of Service]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • October 01, 2024: [Joint Mediation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.