U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-02065
  • Case Name: Heuton et al v. United States of America et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • April 22, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 21, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 18, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 16, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • March 14, 2025: [Amended Notice to Take Deposition]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of Service]
January, 2025
  • January 13, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2024
  • December 26, 2024: [Response to Motion]
October, 2024
  • October 04, 2024: [Notice of Service]
  • October 03, 2024: [Telephone Conference]
  • October 01, 2024: [Setting Telephone Conference]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.