U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cv-04030
  • Case Name: Hayes v. Shawnee County Board of County Commissioners
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • May 01, 2025: [Response]
  • May 01, 2025: [Letter]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • April 29, 2025: [Strike]
  • April 25, 2025: [Letter]
  • April 25, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 22, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 15, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice to Pro Se Re Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • April 07, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 07, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 26, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • March 26, 2025: [Judgment on the Pleadings]
February, 2025
  • February 25, 2025: [Exhibits]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Clerks Order Extending Time to Answer]
  • October 09, 2024: [Order]
  • October 03, 2024: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • October 02, 2024: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.