U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:24-cv-01158
  • Case Name: Soto Hernandez v. Pemmark Transportation, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • May 06, 2025: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • May 05, 2025: [Leave to File Out of Time]
  • May 02, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 01, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 01, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Return of Service of Subpoena]
  • April 30, 2025: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
  • April 30, 2025: [Show Cause]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Out of Time]
  • April 18, 2025: [Leave to File Out of Time]
  • April 18, 2025: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 16, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 16, 2025: [Judgment on the Pleadings]
  • April 14, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 04, 2025: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 04, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Return of Service of Subpoena]
  • March 26, 2025: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
  • March 25, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • March 25, 2025: [Alias Summons Issued]
  • March 21, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 13, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • March 12, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 11, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
October, 2024
  • October 02, 2024: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.