U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cv-04076
  • Case Name: Jaiyeola v. Kight
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • April 04, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • March 17, 2025: [Vacate]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 02, 2024: [Waiver of Service Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.