U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cv-04069
  • Case Name: Mariscal v. Valadez, Jr. et al.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Order]
  • April 25, 2025: [~Util - Case Reopened]
  • April 25, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 23, 2025: [Default Judgment]
  • April 22, 2025: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • April 21, 2025: [Stay Deadlines]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Administratively Closing Case]
  • March 20, 2025: [ADR Report]
October, 2024
  • October 02, 2024: [Response to Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.