U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-02135
  • Case Name: Divot Board, LLC v. Golf Technologies, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Minute Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Pretrial Conference - Initial]
  • April 18, 2025: [Reply]
  • April 07, 2025: [Markman Brief]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Settlement Conference]
  • March 24, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • March 10, 2025: [Markman Brief]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Notice of Service]
  • October 03, 2024: [Answer to Counterclaim]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.