U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-02352
  • Case Name: Ayalla v. National American Postal Workers Union et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • May 09, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • May 05, 2025: [Order]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Filing Fee Paid (Appeal)]
  • April 23, 2025: [Appeal Number Information]
  • April 23, 2025: [Preliminary Record on Appeal Sent]
  • April 23, 2025: [Appeal Filing Fee Waived/Not Paid]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Interlocutory Appeal]
  • April 11, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
October, 2024
  • October 04, 2024: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 04, 2024: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • October 03, 2024: [Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 03, 2024: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 03, 2024: [Answer to Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.