U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:23-cv-01209
  • Case Name: Steele v. Omaha Truck Center Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Administratively Closing Case]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Cancelled Hearing]
  • April 09, 2025: [Pretrial Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Pretrial Conference - Final]
  • March 26, 2025: [Diversity Jurisdiction Statement]
  • March 25, 2025: [Diversity Jurisdiction Statement]
  • March 21, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings - Public]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • March 10, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
December, 2024
  • December 04, 2024: [Response to Motion]
November, 2024
  • November 13, 2024: [Notice to Take Deposition]
October, 2024
  • October 03, 2024: [Notice to Take Deposition]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.