U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cv-04095
  • Case Name: Ulusemre v. Kansas State Department of Education et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 05, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • May 05, 2025: [Clerks Order Extending Time to Answer]
  • May 05, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 05, 2025: [Entry of Appearance]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • April 28, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 23, 2025: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
  • April 21, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • April 21, 2025: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
  • April 15, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 15, 2025: [Counterclaim]
  • April 14, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 09, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • April 04, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • April 04, 2025: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 04, 2025: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • April 03, 2025: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • April 03, 2025: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • April 01, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint]
  • March 31, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
October, 2024
  • October 03, 2024: [Docket Annotation]
  • October 03, 2024: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • October 03, 2024: [Filing Fee Paid]
  • October 03, 2024: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • October 03, 2024: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.