U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:24-cv-01046
  • Case Name: Cardenas v. Hernandez et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 02, 2025: [Response to Motion]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Conventionally Filed Exhibits]
  • April 28, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 25, 2025: [Index of Exhibits]
  • April 25, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal or Redact Document]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Provisionally Sealed Motion]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Conventionally]
  • April 21, 2025: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Proposed Sealed Record]
  • April 21, 2025: [Seal or Redact Document(s)]
  • April 21, 2025: [PROVISIONALLY SEALED Exhibits in Support of Motion]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 04, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Exclude Expert Testimony]
  • March 21, 2025: [Index of Exhibits]
  • March 21, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 21, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • March 21, 2025: [PROVISIONALLY SEALED MOTION]
  • March 21, 2025: [Leave to File Conventionally]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • October 07, 2024: [Notice to Take Deposition]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.