U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-20067-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lee
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • April 30, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order]
  • April 21, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 07, 2025: [Exhibits]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Conventionally]
  • April 04, 2025: [Leave to File Conventionally]
  • April 04, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [Response to Motion]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Status Conference]
  • October 09, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 09, 2024: [~Util - Speedy Trial/Excludable Start]
  • October 08, 2024: [Entry of Appearance for Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.