U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cv-02121
  • Case Name: Makthepharak v. Kelly et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Exhibits]
  • May 02, 2025: [Judgment]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal or Redact Document]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Strike]
January, 2025
  • January 21, 2025: [Response to Motion]
December, 2024
  • December 02, 2024: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Order]
  • October 08, 2024: [Pretrial Conference - Final]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.