U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:23-cr-10096-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Christensen
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Answer to Application for Writ of Continuting Garnishment]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Answer to Application for Writ of Continuting Garnishment]
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 26, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 18, 2025: [Writ of Continuing Garnishment]
  • March 18, 2025: [Application for Writ of Continuing Garnishment]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Notice of Continuance of Change of Plea Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.