U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-02462
  • Case Name: Friederich v. Wachter, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Amend Scheduling Order]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 15, 2025: [Sanctions]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Discovery Hearing]
  • March 14, 2025: [Discovery Hearing]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Docket Annotation]
  • October 09, 2024: [Summons Issued]
  • October 09, 2024: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • October 09, 2024: [Filing Fee Paid]
  • October 09, 2024: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • October 09, 2024: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.