U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-20032-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Castro
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Relief]
  • May 01, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 27, 2025: [Response in Opposition]
  • April 22, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 11, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 11, 2025: [~Util - Speedy Trial/Excludable Start]
  • April 11, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 11, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • April 10, 2025: [Exhibit List]
  • April 09, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Rule 404b]
  • April 07, 2025: [Trial Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Warrant]
  • March 27, 2025: [Withdraw Warrant]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 12, 2025: [Indictment]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Continue]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.