U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-20063-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Clinesmith et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Response to Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Reconsideration]
  • April 10, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • April 10, 2025: [Waiver]
  • April 09, 2025: [Waiver]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • April 04, 2025: [Reconsideration]
  • April 01, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Response to Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [Reply (Other)]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Status Conference]
  • October 09, 2024: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 09, 2024: [~Util - Speedy Trial/Excludable Start]
  • October 09, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 09, 2024: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • October 09, 2024: [Order on Motion to Designate as Complex Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.