U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:24-cr-10120-1
  • Case Name: USA v. White
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 21, 2025: [Return of Service]
  • April 21, 2025: [Service by Publication]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Pretrial and Criminal Case Management Order]
  • October 10, 2024: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 09, 2024: [Order re: Due Process Protections Act]
  • October 09, 2024: [Detention]
  • October 09, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 09, 2024: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 09, 2024: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • October 09, 2024: [Arraignment]
  • October 09, 2024: [Initial Appearance/Rule 5]
  • October 09, 2024: [Financial Affidavit-CJA 23]
  • October 09, 2024: [Continue]
  • October 09, 2024: [Hearing]
  • October 09, 2024: [Warrant Returned Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.