U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:23-cr-40037-6
  • Case Name: USA v. Murdoch et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 24, 2025: [Petition and Order to Enter Plea of Guilty]
  • April 24, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 17, 2025: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 17, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 16, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 26, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 26, 2025: [Petition and Order to Enter Plea of Guilty]
  • March 26, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 14, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 12, 2025: [Continue]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 11, 2024: [Continue]
  • October 10, 2024: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 10, 2024: [Notice of Continuance of Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 10, 2024: [Continue]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.