U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cv-02388
  • Case Name: Carson v. Golden Oaks Healthcare, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [PROVISIONALLY SEALED Exhibits in Support of Motion]
  • May 07, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Cancelled Hearing]
  • April 14, 2025: [Pretrial Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [Pretrial Conference - Final]
  • April 07, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • April 07, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 24, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 14, 2025: [Amended Notice to Take Deposition]
  • March 10, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Show Cause]
  • October 11, 2024: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.