U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 23-11131
  • Case Name: Vienna Sue Cary
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 23, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Support Document]
  • May 22, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Sell]
  • May 22, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Relief from Stay]
  • May 22, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Hearing Held (Other)]
  • May 22, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Courtroom Minute Sheet]
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Generic]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Order]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Transfer of Claim - FEE]
April, 2025
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Clerk's Notice of Hearing (with form)]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Courtroom Minute Sheet]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Withdraw Document]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Courtroom Minute Sheet]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Resolving]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Witness List]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Exhibit List]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Response]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Exhibit]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Trial Reminder Letter]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Brief]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Support Document]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Scheduling Order]
  • March 23, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Clerk's Notice of Hearing (with form)]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Hearing Held (Other)]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Courtroom Minute Sheet]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Hearing Set (Motion)]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection Deadline]
  • October 11, 2024: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Generic Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.