U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-06008
  • Case Name: Kraan Investments (USA) LLC et al v. Tarpenning
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Generic]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Request For Digital Recording]
  • April 28, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
  • April 25, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Courtroom Minute Sheet]
  • April 23, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 15, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Reply]
  • April 14, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Hearing Set (Motion)]
  • April 14, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Response]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Objection Deadline]
  • March 26, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 24, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Correct Defective Pleading(s)]
  • March 24, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Hearing]
  • March 24, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Sanctions]
  • March 17, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Generic Motion]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Generic Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.