U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-40728
  • Case Name: Allison Ann Giago-Wilson and Ashley Elizabeth Giago-Wilson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Modify Plan Payments]
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Retention of Tax Refund]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Pay Wages (Employer)]
  • April 06, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection Deadline]
  • April 06, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Modify Plan Payment]
  • April 06, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Retention of Tax Refunds]
October, 2024
  • October 16, 2024: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [AAutoAsignJudge13]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.