U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-21406
  • Case Name: Tawanda LaShay Jones
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 22, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Borrow]
  • May 19, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Borrow]
  • May 19, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Amended Schedules]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Compensation]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Post-Confirmation Amendment of Plan]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Intended Compromise]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Retention of Tax Refund]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Pay Wages (Debtor)]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Release Wages]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Objection Deadline]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Compensation]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Amend Plan (Post-Confirmation)]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Amended Schedule C (Only)]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Correct Defective Pleading(s)]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Intended Compromise]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Objection Deadline]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Retention of Tax Refunds]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Amended Schedules]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Objection to Claim]
October, 2024
  • October 28, 2024: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [AAutoAsignJudge13]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.