U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-40750
  • Case Name: Alejandro Francisco Rodriguez and Crystal Leann Rodriguez
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 22, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 20, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Pay Wages (Employer)]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Withdraw Document]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Continue Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Continue Hearing]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Hearing Set (Other)]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Hearing]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Dismiss Case]
October, 2024
  • October 29, 2024: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [AAutoAsignJudge13]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.