U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cv-04105
  • Case Name: Robinson et al v. Kansas Department of Corrections et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Response to Motion]
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 22, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion to Stay Discovery]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Cancelled Hearing]
  • April 16, 2025: [Stay Discovery]
  • April 14, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 14, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 02, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 31, 2025: [Setting Status Conference]
  • March 28, 2025: [Designation of Place of Trial]
  • March 28, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 28, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • March 28, 2025: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 18, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 18, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
November, 2024
  • November 04, 2024: [Response to Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.