U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-11146
  • Case Name: Connor Thomas Fosse
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Continue Hearing]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Courtroom Minute Sheet]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Trustee's Interim Report]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim (Late Assets)]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Notice of Recovery of Assets]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Delay Discharge]
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Continue Hearing]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Courtroom Minute Sheet]
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Hearing Continued (Motion)]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Continue Hearing]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Continue Hearing]
November, 2024
  • November 10, 2024: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.