U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-11169
  • Case Name: Amro Mohammed Samy and Darla Gay Samy
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 23, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Amended Order]
  • May 23, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Clerk's Notice of Hearing (with form)]
  • May 23, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Continue Hearing]
  • May 23, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Held (Other)]
  • May 23, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Courtroom Minute Sheet]
  • May 18, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 18, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Objection Deadline]
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Amended Schedule C]
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Amended Schedule C (Only)]
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Amended Schedules]
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Generic Notice]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Generic Text Order]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Operating Report (Monthly, UST Form 11-MOR)]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Corporate Ownership Statement]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Service]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Operating Report (Monthly, UST Form 11-MOR)]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Response]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Generic]
April, 2025
  • April 26, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Set (Other)]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Hearing]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Set Hearing]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Continue Hearing]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Held (Motion)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Courtroom Minute Sheet]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Objection Deadline]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Extend/Limit Chapter 11 Exclusivity Period]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Extend/Shorten Time]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Clerk Notice of Claim Filed Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 501(c)]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Amended Schedule C]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Amendments to Schedules D, E, F, G or H]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Fix Claim Owner]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Extend/Shorten Time]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Extend/Shorten Time]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Operating Report (Monthly, UST Form 11-MOR)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Continue Hearing]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Generic Text Order]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Clerk's Notice of Hearing (with form)]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Held (Other)]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Courtroom Minute Sheet]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Generic Notice]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Set Hearing]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Operating Report (Monthly, UST Form 11-MOR)]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Order on Generic Motion]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Set (Motion)]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Response]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Appoint Trustee]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Amended Schedules]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Amendments to Schedules D, E, F, G or H]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Substitute Attorney Or Withdraw As Attorney]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Objection Deadline]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Extend/Limit Chapter 11 Exclusivity Period]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Extend/Shorten Time]
January, 2025
  • January 23, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Order]
November, 2024
  • November 17, 2024: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.