U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-40796
  • Case Name: Dal Leon Astle
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Request for Notice]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Dismiss Case]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Courtroom Minute Sheet]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Administrative Expenses]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Modify Plan Payments]
April, 2025
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection Deadline]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Withdraw Document]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Hearing Set (Motion)]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection Deadline]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Administrative Expenses]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Modify Plan Payment]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection Deadline]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Dismiss Case]
January, 2025
  • January 21, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
November, 2024
  • November 19, 2024: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 [DeBN Request Form]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.