U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-11193
  • Case Name: Darren Allen Martin
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Hearing Set (Motion)]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Response]
  • May 03, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Objection Deadline]
  • May 03, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Relief from Stay]
  • May 03, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Order]
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Trustee's Interim Report]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim (Late Assets)]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Notice of Recovery of Assets]
March, 2025
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Request for Notice]
November, 2024
  • November 24, 2024: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.