U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-21427
  • Case Name: Apple Central KC LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Messerli, Robbin L [Chapter 11 Operating Report (Monthly, Small Business or Subchapter V, UST Form 425C)]
  • May 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Messerli, Robbin L [Continue Hearing]
  • May 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Messerli, Robbin L [Courtroom Minute Sheet]
  • May 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Messerli, Robbin L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Messerli, Robbin L [Assume/Reject]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Messerli, Robbin L [Objection Deadline]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Messerli, Robbin L [Objection to Claim]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Messerli, Robbin L [Service]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Messerli, Robbin L [Courtroom Minute Sheet]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Messerli, Robbin L [Continue Hearing]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Messerli, Robbin L [Chapter 11 Operating Report (Monthly, Small Business or Subchapter V, UST Form 425C)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Messerli, Robbin L [Order]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Messerli, Robbin L [Amended Creditor Matrix (Fee)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Messerli, Robbin L [Certificate of Service]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Messerli, Robbin L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Messerli, Robbin L [Amended Order]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Messerli, Robbin L [Chapter 11 Operating Report (Monthly, Small Business or Subchapter V, UST Form 425C)]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Messerli, Robbin L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Messerli, Robbin L [Change of Address]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Messerli, Robbin L [Continue Hearing]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Messerli, Robbin L [Order on Generic Motion]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Messerli, Robbin L [Generic Motion]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Messerli, Robbin L [Generic Motion]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Messerli, Robbin L [Order on Generic Motion]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Messerli, Robbin L [Hearing Set (Motion)]
November, 2024
  • November 29, 2024: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Messerli, Robbin L [Status Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.