U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-21543
  • Case Name: Terry J. Mason and August Yvonne Mason
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Withdraw Document]
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Continue Hearing]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Certificate of Service]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Objection Deadline]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Continue Hearing]
  • April 06, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Modify Plan Payments]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Continue Hearing]
November, 2024
  • November 29, 2024: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [AAutoAsignJudge13]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.