U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-11167
  • Case Name: S & O Investments, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 23, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Amended Order]
  • May 23, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Continue Hearing]
  • May 23, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Held (Other)]
  • May 23, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Courtroom Minute Sheet]
  • May 23, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Held (Motion)]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Support Document]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Continue Hearing]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Generic]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Clerk's Notice of Hearing (with form)]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Operating Report (Monthly, UST Form 11-MOR)]
  • April 26, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Set (Motion)]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Amended Motion/Application]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Cash Collateral]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Continuation of Utility Service]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Continue Hearing]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Held (Motion)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Courtroom Minute Sheet]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Objection Deadline]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Cash Collateral]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Extend/Limit Chapter 11 Exclusivity Period]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Extend/Shorten Time]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Operating Report (Monthly, UST Form 11-MOR)]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Objection Deadline]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Generic Motion]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Substitute Attorney Or Withdraw As Attorney]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Objection Deadline]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Generic Text Order]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Clerk's Notice of Hearing (with form)]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Held (Other)]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Courtroom Minute Sheet]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Objection Deadline]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Extend/Shorten Time]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Objection Deadline]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Extend/Shorten Time]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Substitute Attorney Or Withdraw As Attorney]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Opinion]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Objection Deadline]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Extend/Limit Chapter 11 Exclusivity Period]
December, 2024
  • December 06, 2024: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Response]
  • December 02, 2024: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 11 [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.