U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-11235
  • Case Name: Torie L Collins
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 19, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Clerk's Notice of Hearing (with form)]
  • May 18, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Objection]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Support Document]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Correct Defective Pleading(s)]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Trustee's Interim Report]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Generic Motion]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Hearing Held (Motion)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Courtroom Minute Sheet]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Relief from Stay-Denied]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Hearing Set (Motion)]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Objection]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Objection Deadline]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Order]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Relief from Stay]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Correct Defective Pleading(s)]
December, 2024
  • December 07, 2024: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.