U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-21391
  • Case Name: Tara Lee Hughes
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Objection Deadline]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Intended Compromise]
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Order on Generic Motion]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Generic Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Employ]
December, 2024
  • December 08, 2024: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Financial Management Course]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.