U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-40849
  • Case Name: David Brian Hubbel and Kimberly Sue Hubbel
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Adequate Protection]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Relief from Stay]
March, 2025
  • March 29, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Borrow]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Continue Hearing]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Pay Wages (Debtor)]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection Deadline]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Extend/Shorten Time]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Amended Schedules]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Extend/Shorten Time]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Borrow]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection Deadline]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
December, 2024
  • December 11, 2024: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [AAutoAsignJudge13]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.