U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-02190
  • Case Name: Shelter Mutual Insurance Company v. McGuyer
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Pretrial Order]
  • May 01, 2025: [Pretrial Conference - Final]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • March 10, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
December, 2024
  • December 16, 2024: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.