U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-40862
  • Case Name: James Franklin Hockett and Diann Lynn Hockett
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Relief from Stay]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Resolving]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Withdraw Document]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Courtroom Minute Sheet]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Continue Hearing]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Continue Hearing]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Hearing Set (Motion)]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection Deadline]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Extend/Shorten Time]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Extend/Shorten Time]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Order]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Relief from Stay]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Withdraw Document]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Continue Hearing]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
December, 2024
  • December 17, 2024: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [AAutoAsignJudge13]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.