U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cv-02417
  • Case Name: Rodriguez Juarez v. Midwest Division - OPRMC, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Appeal Number Information]
  • May 07, 2025: [Preliminary Record on Appeal Sent]
  • May 07, 2025: [Letter re Record Complete]
  • May 06, 2025: [Notice of Cross Appeal]
  • May 06, 2025: [Transcript Order Form]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 23, 2025: [Appeal Number Information]
  • April 23, 2025: [Preliminary Record on Appeal Sent]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • April 22, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 08, 2025: [Alter Judgment]
  • April 07, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 07, 2025: [Memorandum & Order - DO NOT USE TO RULE ON MOTIONS]
  • April 07, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • April 02, 2025: [SEALED Transcript]
  • April 02, 2025: [Transcript]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Reply]
  • March 21, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 20, 2025: [Bill of Costs - Memorandum in Support of]
  • March 20, 2025: [Bill of Costs]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 17, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 14, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 11, 2025: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • March 05, 2025: [Response to Motion]
February, 2025
  • February 27, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
January, 2025
  • January 12, 2025: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
December, 2024
  • December 23, 2024: [Exhibit List]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.