U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-11304
  • Case Name: Monique Lynne Boyd
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 21, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Order]
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Transfer of Claim - FEE]
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Hearing Held (Other)]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Courtroom Minute Sheet]
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Continue Hearing]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Courtroom Minute Sheet]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
January, 2025
  • January 06, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Financial Management Course]
December, 2024
  • December 29, 2024: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 26, 2024: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [AAutoAsignJudge13]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.