U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-21564
  • Case Name: Melonie Rockell Weston
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Objection to Claim]
March, 2025
  • March 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Pay Wages (Debtor)]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Release Wages]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Pay Wages (Employer)]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Release Wages]
December, 2024
  • December 27, 2024: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Financial Management Course]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.