U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-21666
  • Case Name: Fred Dumont Hill
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 22, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 22, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • May 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Employ]
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Discharging Debtor(s)]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim (Late Assets)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Objection Deadline]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Employ]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Notice of Recovery of Assets]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Complaint]
January, 2025
  • January 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Employee Income Records]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.