U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-20003
  • Case Name: Sony Aurora Sacks
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
April, 2025
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Final Decree]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Reaffirmation Reviewed]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Reaffirmation Agreement]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Reaffirmation Reviewed]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Reaffirmation Agreement]
January, 2025
  • January 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Financial Management Course]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.