U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-11205
  • Case Name: Robert Eric Walterscheid, Jr. and Delilah Elizabeth Walterscheid
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Trustee's Interim Report]
  • April 13, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Support Document]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Withdraw Document]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Order Setting Deadline for Submission of Order]
January, 2025
  • January 05, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.