U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-11113
  • Case Name: Michael Wedman and Jessica Wedman
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 23, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
  • May 21, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 19, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Pay Wages (Employer)]
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Hearing Held (Other)]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Courtroom Minute Sheet]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Withdraw Document]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Order Setting Deadline for Submission of Order]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Clerk Notice of Claim Filed Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 501(c)]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Hearing Held (Other)]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Continue Hearing]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Courtroom Minute Sheet]
January, 2025
  • January 09, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Withdraw Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.