U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 23-21452
  • Case Name: Vincent Weatherspoon, Sr.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Pay Wages (Debtor)]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Allow Claims]
  • March 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Allow Claims]
January, 2025
  • January 13, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Withdraw Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.