U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cm-50016-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rogers
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Modifying Conditions of Release]
  • April 24, 2025: [Modifying Conditions of Release]
  • April 24, 2025: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • April 24, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 10, 2025: [Modifying Conditions of Release]
  • April 10, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 10, 2025: [Waiver]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 07, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 01, 2025: [Withdrawal and Entry of Appearance of Substituted Counsel]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 26, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • March 26, 2025: [Continue]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 25, 2025: [Continue]
  • March 13, 2025: [Modifying Conditions of Release]
  • March 12, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • March 12, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 11, 2025: [Transcript]
January, 2025
  • January 16, 2025: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.